EP3264579 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING POWER SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki Tama-Shi, Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Hiroki c/o MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | 02 /
MURATA, Yukio c/o MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16755293.4 | 17.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016JP54530 | Priority number, date | JP20150032442 | 23.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015032442 | [2018/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016136546 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264579 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/28, H02M1/12, H02M1/32 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M3/335 (KR);
H02M1/08 (US);
G01R15/04 (KR);
G01R19/2506 (KR);
G01R31/40 (KR);
H02M1/36 (KR);
H02M3/33523 (EP,US);
H02M1/0012 (US);
H02M1/322 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | H02M3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT ZUR STEUERUNG EINER STROMQUELLE | [2018/01] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING POWER SOURCE | [2018/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DESTINÉ À COMMANDER UN BLOC D'ALIMENTATION | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2017 | Translation filed | 23.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 23.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013027983 (NATE SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2013147440 (SHIROYAMA HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0080] , [0081] , [0082] , [0091] , [0103] , [0104]; figures 6,8 * [A] 2,3; | [A]US2013242626 (LI EN [CN]) [A] 1-4* paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050]; figure 5 * | International search | [YA]WO2012140840 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 4 * , paragraphs [0157] to [0164]; fig. 11B to 11C & US 2014/0036561 A1 paragraphs [0184] to [0191]; fig. 11B to 11C * [A] 2-3; | [YA]JP2014204573 (CANON KK) [Y] 1, 4 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0020]; fig. 8 & US 2014/0301117 A1 paragraphs [0023] to [0030]; fig. 8 *[A] 2-3 |