EP3262226 - ELECTRIC POWER CONTROL DEVICE FOR LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEO, Kwangchul IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Wooseong IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 51 Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16755831.1 | 22.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016KR01714 | Priority number, date | KR20150025102 | 23.02.2015 Original published format: KR 20150025102 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016137181 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3262226 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/02, D06F58/28 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
D06F29/00 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/10 (EP,KR,US);
D06F29/005 (US);
H02H3/08 (US);
D06F2103/44 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2105/62 (EP,KR,US);
D06F25/00 (EP,KR,US);
D06F33/47 (EP,KR,US);
D06F33/74 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/32 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/42 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/50 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Title | German: | STROMSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/01] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER CONTROL DEVICE FOR LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2018/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LINGE | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 18.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4124650 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9,14 * column 1, lines 3-65; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9409738U (WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-20 * page 1, line 29 - page 3, line 28 * * page 5, line 3 - page 5, line 12 * * figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE19824168 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 25 - column 4, line 65 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]US2003216818 (DAMRATH JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1,9-20* abstract *; | [A]EP2113604 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1,8,9,11,14,18 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0064] * * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]DE102009026528 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 9,10,13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0033] * * figures 1-2; claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0033] * [I] 1-8,11,12,15,18-20 | International search | [A]KR20080010047 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0062]-[0066] and figure 4. *; | [A]WO2008148400 (ATASSI MOHAMED RADWAN RAFAAT [EG]) [A] 1-20* See page 2, lines 12-20; and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]US2010008006 (SATORU MATSUMOTO [KR], et al) [Y] 4, 10, 15 * See paragraphs [0020] and [0052]-[0054]; claim 1; and figures 3-4. *; | [A]KR20100099977 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0044]-[0058] and figure 6. *; | [XY]US2011041258 (KO HONG SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-9, 11-14 , 16-20 * See paragraphs [0037], [0040], [0045], [0047]-[0050], [0054]-[0055], [0058], [0060]-[0061], [0064], and [0070]-[0077]; claims 1-2 and 17; and figures 1-4 and 6. * [Y] 4, 10, 15 |