EP3341057 - MONITORING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHL Medical AG Gubelstrasse 22 PO Box 7710 6302 Zug / CH | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Carebay Europe Ltd. 57 Tigne Palace, Suite 3 Bisazza Street Sliema, SLM 1643 / MT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GYLLEBY, Stefan Idrottstigen 2 184 94 Akersberga / SE | 02 /
SÄLL, Daniel Jägmästarvägen 1 14173 Segeltorp / SE | [2019/38] |
Former [2018/27] | 01 /
GYLLEBY, Stefan Inedalsgatan 25 112 33 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
SÄLL, Daniel Jägmästarvägen 1 14173 Segeltorp / SE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16756624.9 | 08.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016EP68879 | Priority number, date | EP20150182213 | 24.08.2015 Original published format: EP 15182213 | SE20160050240 | 24.02.2016 Original published format: SE 1650240 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017032586 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341057 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3341057 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/20, A61M5/31 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/20 (EP,KR,SE,US);
A61M5/31566 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/315 (SE);
A61M5/31568 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/3157 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2005/3142 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3306 (KR);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6045 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6054 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSEINHEIT | [2018/27] | English: | MONITORING UNIT | [2018/27] | French: | UNITÉ DE SURVEILLANCE | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 02.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.2023
25.01.2023
ADMISSIBLE Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Dirix, Yvo Ypsomed AG Patents Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2023/09] | 10.02.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.06.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2016 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IE | 08.08.2022 | LU | 08.08.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.08.2016 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.08.2016 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011270214 (JOERGENSEN BJARKE DUPONT [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,12-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2014005950 (GROESCHKE JASMIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,12-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 29] , [0 30] , [0 35] - [0037] - [0 43] - [0052] - [0 95] - [0097] - [ 103] , [ 105] - [0107] - [ 110] * * claims 16-28 * [I] 2,4-11; | [X]US2014194825 (NIELSEN OLE CHRISTIAN [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,12-14 * figures 5A-9B ** paragraphs [0058] - [0069] *; | [X]WO2014111337 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,3,12-14 * figures 3-7 * * page 5, line 24 - page 14, line 23 *; | [XD]WO2014128156 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [XD] 1,3,12-15 * page 8, line 13 - page 16, line 14 * * figures 3-10 * | Opposition | WO2012085031 | US2014005950 | US2014194825 | WO2014111337 | WO2014128156 | WO2014173771 | US2015202376 | WO2015121081 | EP3220976 | EP3256193 |