EP3338051 - DISTRIBUTED DELAY-LINE FOR LOW-COHERENCE INTERFEROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medlumics S.L. Plaza de la Encina 10-11, Núcleo 3, 2°A 28760 Tres Cantos, Madrid / ES | [2020/20] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Medlumics S.L. Ronda de Pontiente 6 2A-B 28760 Tres Cantos / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANCHO DURÁ, Juan Camí Les Moles s/n Aptdo.139 46658 Canals / ES | 02 /
MARTIN, Alberto Plaza Valparaíso 7 4 C Esc Dcha 28016 Madrid / ES | 03 /
RUBIO GIVERNAU, José Luis Av. Isabel de Valois 16B 3B 28050 Madrid / ES | 04 /
MARGALLO BALBÁS, Eduardo Paseo de la Florida 16 6G 28008 Madrid / ES | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/26] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16757209.8 | 19.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016EP69673 | Priority number, date | US201562207049P | 19.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562207049 P | US201615237299 | 15.08.2016 Original published format: US201615237299 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017029386 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338051 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3338051 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G02B6/12, G02B6/28, G02B6/293, // A61B3/10 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01B9/02028 (EP,US);
G01B9/02051 (EP,US);
G02B6/12004 (US);
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/2861 (EP,US);
G02B6/2935 (EP,US);
G02B6/43 (US);
A61B3/102 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | G01B9/02, G02B6/12, G02B6/28, G02B6/43, A61B3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILTE VERZÖGERUNGSLEITUNG FÜR KURZKOHÄRENZINTERFEROMETRIE | [2021/11] | English: | DISTRIBUTED DELAY-LINE FOR LOW-COHERENCE INTERFEROMETRY | [2018/26] | French: | LIGNE DE RETARD DISTRIBUÉ POUR INTERFÉROMÉTRIE À FAIBLE COHÉRENCE | [2021/11] |
Former [2018/26] | VERTEILTE VERZÖGERUNGSLEITUNG FÜR INTERFEROMETRIE MIT NIEDRIGER KOHÄRENZ | ||
Former [2018/26] | LIGNE DE RETARD DISTRIBUÉE POUR INTERFÉROMÉTRIE À FAIBLE COHÉRENCE | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 09.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21186602.5 / EP3943879 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2016 | AL | 21.07.2021 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | GR | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | IE | 19.08.2021 | LU | 19.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/36] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6775007 (IZATT JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-10,29,30 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 67 * * column 5, line 5 - line 56; figures 1-3 * * column 8, line 38 - column 13, line 8; figures 10-17 * [I] 2,7,11-19; | [XI]US2014078510 (RUBIO GUIVERNAU JOSE LUIS [ES], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,11,13-15,18,20,22-25,27,29,30 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044]; figures 4a,b * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058]; figures 7-12 * [I] 2,6,7,9,10,12,16,17,19,21,26,28; | [XI]US2014160430 (KO TONY H [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059]; figures 5a,b * [I] 11; | [A]US2014368828 (LLORET SOLER JUAN [ES], et al) [A] 2,7,12,17,21,26 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-3 ** paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0066]; figure 10 * | by applicant | WO2013001032 |