EP3341369 - FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS S1P MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | For all designated states AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Mainzer Strasse 81 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGE, Udo c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
OCHSE, Michael c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
VAN DER KAM, Elizabeth c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
VAN BERGEIJK, Jeroen c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
TURNER, Sean c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
OELLIEN, Frank c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
WALLESER, Patrick c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08 /
AMBERG, Wilhelm c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 09 /
HORNBERGER, Wilfried c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 10 /
GENESTE, Herve c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 11 /
MEZLER, Mario c/o AbbVie Deutschland GmbH&Co. KG Knollstrasse 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 12 /
HUTCHINS, Charles c/o AbbVie Inc 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16757262.7 | 26.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016EP70225 | Priority number, date | WO2015CN88447 | 28.08.2015 Original published format: PCT/CN2015/088447 | US201562242558P | 16.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562242558 P | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017036978 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341369 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61K31/4375, A61P25/00 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS S1P-MODULATOREN | [2018/27] | English: | FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS S1P MODULATORS | [2018/27] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES CONDENSÉS À TITRE DE MODULATEURS DE S1P | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 21.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0059510 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * see step C in example 101 on p. 183 *; | [A]WO2012004373 (ABBOTT HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-18* see structure of the S1P5 agonists according to claim 1 *; | [X]EP2650284 (MERZ PHARMA GMBH & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,15-18 * see examples 40 to 42 and 77 in table 1 *; | [X]WO2015095097 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * see steps B and C in the synthesis of intermediates 29 and 43 on p. 50 and 61 and steps A and B in the synthesis of intermediate 47 on p. 64 * |