EP3359630 - NANO SUSPENSION LUBRICANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Limited Petroleum House 17 Jamshedji Tata Road Churchgate Mumbai, Maharashtra 400020 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Limited Petroleum House, 17 Jamshedji Tata Road Churchgate Maharashtra Mumbai 400020 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMPALA, Annaji Rajiv Kumar Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Ltd. HP Green R&D Centre KIADB Industrial Area Tarabanahalli, Devanagundi, Hoskote Bengluru 560067 / IN | 02 /
VADAPALLI, Srinivas GITAM University Department of Mechanical Engineering Rushikonda Visakhapatnam 530045 / IN | 03 /
JAIN, Amitabh Kumar Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Limited R&D Centre Plot D-500 TTC Industrial Area, Turbhe Navi Mumbai Thane 400705 / IN | 04 /
PEDDY, Venkata Chalapathi Rao Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Ltd. HP Green R&D Centre KIADB Industrial Area Tarabanahalli, Devanagundi, Hoskote Bengluru 560067 / IN | 05 /
NETTEM, Venkateswarlu Choudary Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Ltd. HP Green R&D Centre KIADB Industrial Area Tarabanahalli, Devanagundi, Hoskote Bengluru 560067 / IN | 06 /
GANDHAM, Sri Ganesh Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Ltd. Visakh Refinery P.B. No. 15 Malkapuram Visakhapatnam 530011 / IN | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16757364.1 | 30.06.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016IN50208 | Priority number, date | IN2015MUM3793 | 06.10.2015 Original published format: IN 3793MU2015 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017060918 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359630 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C10M157/10, C10M171/06 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C10M171/06 (EP,US);
C10M101/02 (US);
C10M157/10 (EP,US);
C10M177/00 (US);
C10M2201/05 (EP,US);
C10M2201/065 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (EP,US);
C10M2203/022 (EP,US);
C10M2203/06 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10N2020/06 (EP,US);
C10N2020/061 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/10 (EP,US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | NANO-SUSPENSIONSSCHMIERMITTEL | [2018/33] | English: | NANO SUSPENSION LUBRICANTS | [2018/33] | French: | LUBRIFIANTS À NANOSUSPENSION | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 03.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN101200667 ; | [Y]WO0194504 (CROMPTON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 8,13* examples 24,5; claims 13-18,20 *; | [Y]US2008138643 (LEE KWI-JONG [KR], et al) [Y] 8,11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0013] , [0014] , [0015] , [0018]; claims 1-3,8,14 *; | [IY]US2011046028 (CHOI CHEOL [KR], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064]; figure 1; claims 1-6 * [Y] 8,12; | [Y]FR3004723 (TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING [FR]) [Y] 13 * page 23 - page 27; examples 1,2 L4-L5; tables I-IV *; | [IY] - KOSHY CHACKO PRENO ET AL, "Evaluation of the tribological and thermo-physical properties of coconut oil added with MoS2nanoparticles at elevated temperatures", WEAR, (20150105), vol. 330, doi:10.1016/J.WEAR.2014.12.044, ISSN 0043-1648, pages 288 - 308, XP029231100 [I] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [02.1] , [02.2] , [02.3] , [02.7] , [03.3]; figures 6,7,10,12,16 * [Y] 8,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.wear.2014.12.044 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (2008), vol. 2008, no. 72, Database accession no. 2008-M15935, XP002762764 & CN101200667 A 20080618 (CHINA NAT PETROLEUM CORP) [Y] 11 * abstract * |