EP3503944 - FLOW INDICATOR FOR AN INFUSION PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avent, Inc. 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHAM, Bao-Tram N. 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | 02 /
COKER, Justin 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | 03 /
DUFFY, Shane A. 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | 04 /
DAVENPORT, Judith 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | 05 /
HSU, Kenneth C. 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | 06 /
MASSENGALE, Ryan 5405 Windward Parkway Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16757535.6 | 24.08.2016 | [2019/27] | WO2016US48258 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018038713 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503944 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/168, G01P13/00, G01F3/20, A61B5/087 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/1684 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/16886 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/141 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/14586 (US);
A61M5/148 (KR);
A61M2005/1405 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2005/14208 (KR);
A61M2205/0216 (US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3389 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSSANZEIGER FÜR EINE INFUSIONSPUMPE | [2019/27] | English: | FLOW INDICATOR FOR AN INFUSION PUMP | [2019/27] | French: | INDICATEUR DE DÉBIT POUR POMPE DE PERFUSION. | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 31.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3675722 (BALMES MARK E SR) [A] 20* figures 1-5 *; | [XA]US6010482 (KRIESEL MARSHALL S [US], et al) [X] 16-19 * figures 13-17 * [A] 1-15,20; | [A]US7665346 (STAUFFER ANTON [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2013083191 (LOWERY MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-2B *; | [XA]DE102013111800 (NIEDENZU DOMINIK [DE]) [X] 16-19 * figure 1 * [A] 1-15,20 |