EP3325370 - CONTAINER AND CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Threadless Closures Limited The Priory Ketton, Rutland PE9 3RD / GB | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRASER, Anthony Henry Joseph The Priory Ketton Rutland PE9 3RD / GB | 02 /
HEIN, John Glenelg Low Barn Burley Lane Menston Leeds LS29 6EX / GB | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16757927.5 | 21.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016GB52215 | Priority number, date | WO2015GB52154 | 24.07.2015 Original published format: PCT/GB2015/052154 | GB20150018819 | 23.10.2015 Original published format: GB 201518819 | GB20150022544 | 21.12.2015 Original published format: GB 201522544 | GB20160001501 | 27.01.2016 Original published format: GB 201601501 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017017415 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325370 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/16, B65D41/06, B65D43/02 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B65D41/065 (EP,KR);
B65D43/0231 (EP,KR);
B65D2543/00972 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER UND VERSCHLUSS | [2018/22] | English: | CONTAINER AND CLOSURE | [2018/22] | French: | RÉCIPIENT ET FERMETURE | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5135124 (WOBSER GREGORY S [US]) [X] 1,9,29,33-36,55-57 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6-8,10,11; | [Y]US2005242055 (OH JACK S [US]) [Y] 2,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]BE487098 (M. KELLER) [Y] 6,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6006942 (MORRIS SR GLENN H [US], et al) [Y] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [XY]US3458079 (GASBARRA ANTHONY J) [X] 50 * the whole document * [Y] 51-53; | [YA]DE895998 (KNIEPKAMP HEINRICH ERNST DIPL-) [Y] 51-53 * the whole document * [A] 1-49; | [XA]US2008257848 (FARRAR PETER ANTONY [GB], et al) [X] 1,33-36 * the whole document * [A] 2-7,9-28,30-32,37-53,55-57 |