Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3337478

Designated contracting statesALLapse: 12.08.2020
 AT 
 BE 
 BGLapse: 12.11.2020
 CH 
CYLapse: 12.08.2020
 CZ 
 DE 
 DKLapse: 12.08.2020
 EELapse: 12.08.2020
 ES 
 FILapse: 12.08.2020
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HRLapse: 12.08.2020
 HULapse: 19.08.2016
 IE 
 ISLapse: 12.12.2020
 IT 
 LI 
 LTLapse: 12.08.2020
 LU 
 LVLapse: 12.08.2020
 MCLapse: 12.08.2020
 MKLapse: 12.08.2020
 MTLapse: 12.08.2020
 NL 
 NOLapse: 12.11.2020
 PL 
 PT 
 ROLapse: 12.08.2020
 RSLapse: 12.08.2020
 SE 
 SI 
 SKLapse: 12.08.2020
 SMLapse: 12.08.2020
 TR 
Validation states MA 
 MD 
Examination procedure06.07.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase19.03.2018National basic fee paid 
19.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted12.08.2020
Opposition procedure09.03.2023Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition11.05.2023APPEAL FILED
11.05.2023DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE
11.07.2023APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
16.05.2023APPEAL FILED
16.05.2023APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
16.05.2023DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:27.06.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:27.06.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20180319
 
Event date:27.06.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:05.12.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:23.01.2019 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20181219
 
Event date:18.10.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1257250 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:15.07.2020 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20200616
 
Event date:12.08.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:05.12.2018 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:14.08.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:14.08.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:E. BLUM AND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE , CH
 
Event date:03.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602016041875 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:15.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1300845 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20200915
 
Event date:02.09.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:06.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:28.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:19.10.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 3337478 PT 20201019 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20201013
 
Event date:14.12.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20200402923 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20201116
 
Event date:28.12.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:15.06.2020 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:10.07.2020 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:07.07.2020 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201112
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201112
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:29.01.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:26.02.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20201212
 
Event date:10.07.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:15.06.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:21.12.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:25.05.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:04.03.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:07.11.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:25.05.2018 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:30.04.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:19.05.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2826826 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20210519
 
Event date:06.05.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602016041875 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:09.06.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:SANDOZ AG
Effective DATE:20210506
 
Event date:15.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT UEP 1300845 AT T
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:23.06.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:GENERICS (UK) LIMITED
Effective DATE:20210512
 
Event date:30.06.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:08.12.2021 
Event description:REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3
 
Event date:09.06.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2
 
Event date:27.05.2021 
Event description:NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2
 
Event date:21.05.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:07.05.2021 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:30.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20200812
 
Event date:12.05.2023 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO
 
Event date:12.05.2023 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO
 
Event date:12.05.2023 
Event description:DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O
 
Event date:17.05.2023 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO
 
Event date:17.05.2023 
Event description:DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O
 
Event date:17.05.2023 
Event description:DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O
 
Event date:05.07.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230526
 
Event date:11.07.2023 
Event description:DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O
 
Event date:22.12.2023 
Event description:OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO
 
Event date:24.01.2024 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
OPPONENT:SANDOZ AG
Effective DATE:20210506
 
Event date:05.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20240611
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:08.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20240627
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20240611
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:01.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20240603
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20240611
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:03.09.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20240705
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:16.09.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20240814
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20240625
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:11.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20240712
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:14.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20240819
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:15.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20240703
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:21.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20240901
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:21.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20240909
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:23.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20240731
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:24.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20240725
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20240627
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20240710
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:29.11.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20240731
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO
 
Event date:05.03.2025 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
OPPONENT:SANDOZ AG
Effective DATE:20210506