13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
26.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
05.06.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
02.06.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
25.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.11.2019 |
First examination report |
|
18.11.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.05.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
11.05.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
27.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
08.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
08.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
16.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
11.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|