EP3300501 - NOVEL COMPOSITIONS, USES AND METHODS FOR MAKING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pimera, Inc. 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADDACH, Mustapha 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16759401.9 | 02.03.2016 | [2018/14] | WO2016US20418 | Priority number, date | US201562128208P | 04.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562128208 P | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016141042 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3300501 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/14, A61K31/4353, A61P35/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/4353 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/22 (EP,US);
C07D487/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/14] | C07D471/14, C07D487/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, A61K31/4375, A61K31/519, A61K31/4985, A61K31/5025 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERWENDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/14] | English: | NOVEL COMPOSITIONS, USES AND METHODS FOR MAKING THEM | [2018/14] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS, LEURS UTILISATIONS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2018/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/14] | 11.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 16.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2018 | Decision despatched | 16.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009046383 (CYLENE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-10,14,15 * claims 1, 31 *; | [A] - BEAULIEU ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of 4-amino derivatives of benzimidazoquinoxaline, benzimidazoquinoline, and benzopyrazoloquinazoline as potent IKK inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070214), vol. 17, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2006.12.017, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1233 - 1237, XP005888454 [A] 1-10,14,15 * table 1, compounds 7a-d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2006.12.017 | [X] - WOLFGANG-R. KNAPPE, "Photochemie des 10-Phenylisoalloxazins: Intramolekulare Singulett- und intermolekulare Triplett-Reaktionen", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, DE, (19740501), vol. 107, no. 5, doi:10.1002/cber.19741070520, ISSN 0009-2940, pages 1614 - 1636, XP055524260 [X] 1,2 * page 1625; compound 17a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19741070520 | [X] - V I Shvedov ET AL, "Synthesis of derivatives of pyrazino[1,2-a]benzimidazole, aza analogs of[beta]-carboline", (19691031), URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/BF00762071.pdf, (20181115), XP055524256 [X] 1,2 * compound IV * | International search | [X]WO0228860 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [X] 19 * See abstract; pages 25-26, 34, 46. *; | [PX]WO2015172123 (HADDACH MUSTAPHA [US]) [PX] 1-15, 17-21* See abstract; claims 1-33. *; | [XA] - Chemical Abstract, (19961211), Database accession no. 183858-24-4, URL: STN, XP 055409388 [X] 1-2 * ,. See the structures. * [A] 3-15, 17-21 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACT, (19961211), Database accession no. 183858-23-3, URL: STN, XP 055409391 | [XA] - Chemical Abstract, (19841218), Database accession no. 93438-49-4, URL: STN, XP055410392 [X] 1-2 * . See the structure. * [A] 3-15, 17-21 | [XA] - ZANZOUL, A. et al., "A benzimidazopyridoquinoxaline as promising scaffold for G-quadruplex DNA targeting", Medicinal chemistry research, (20140000), vol. 23, pages 4042 - 4049, XP 055327267 [X] 19-20 * . See abstract; page 4042; scheme 1. * [A] 1-15, 17-18, 21 | [X] - ANDALOUSSI, M. et al., "Novel imidazo[1,2-a]naphthyridinic systems (Part 1): Synthesis, antiproliferative and DNA-intercalating activities", Eur. J. Med. Chem., (20080000), vol. 43, pages 2505 - 2517, XP 025571383 [X] 19 * . See abstract; table 1. * | [A] - MOGILAIAH, K. et al., "Synthesis of some novel bridgehead nitrogen heterocyclic systems containing 1,8-naphthyridine moiety", Indian J. Chem., (20030000), vol. 42 B, pages 192 - 194, XP 055236419 [A] 1-15, 17-21 * . See scheme 1, compound 5. * |