EP3265913 - METHODS, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEMS FOR SURVEILLANCE OF THIRD-PARTY DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY VENDORS PROVIDING SECONDARY CONTENT IN AN INTERNET CONTENT PUBLISHER'S WEB PAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evidon, Inc. 10 East 39th Street 8th Floor New York, New York 10016 / US | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Patrick M. 104 S Portland Avenue Apt. 2A Brooklyn, New York 11217 / US | 02 /
DEMILLE, Vern 787 W. 1875 S. Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | 03 /
KILRAIN, Joseph C. 23 Heritage Drive Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US | 04 /
MEYER, Scott 8 James Road Mount Kisco, New York 10549 / US | 05 /
DONOHOO, Justin 5309 West Briar Park Road Herriman, Utah 84096 / US | 06 /
KOZEK, Edward 190 Spring Street New York, New York 10012 / US | 07 /
VAN OSS, Bree 4338 Rabbit Pond Road Tallahassee, Florida 32309 / US | 08 /
SIGNANINI, Jose Maria 505 W 37th Street Apt 3510 New York, New York 10018 / US | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Woodhouse, Thomas Duncan, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16759448.0 | 02.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016US20531 | Priority number, date | US201562127281P | 02.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562127281 P | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016141109 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3265913 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F15/16, G06Q30/02 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
G06F11/00 (EP);
G06F11/323 (EP);
G06F11/3419 (EP);
G06F16/9566 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06Q30/0241 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/02] | G06F11/00, G06F15/16, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEME ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON VERKÄUFERN DIGITALER TECHNOLOGIEN VON DRITTANBIETERN, DIE SEKUNDÄREN INHALT AUF DER WEBSEITE EINES INTERNETSEITENINHALTSHERAUSGEBERS BEREITSTELLEN | [2018/02] | English: | METHODS, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEMS FOR SURVEILLANCE OF THIRD-PARTY DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY VENDORS PROVIDING SECONDARY CONTENT IN AN INTERNET CONTENT PUBLISHER'S WEB PAGE | [2018/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME POUR LA SURVEILLANCE DE VENDEURS DE TECHNOLOGIE NUMÉRIQUE TIERS INTRODUISANT UN CONTENU SECONDAIRE DANS UNE PAGE WEB D'ÉDITEUR DE CONTENU INTERNET | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 02.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2018 | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5974572 (WEINBERG AMIR [IL], et al) [I] 1-17 * column 7, line 41 - line 65 * * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 27 * * column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 23 * * column 11, line 66 - column 12, line 9 * * column 15, line 41 - column 16, line 59 * * column 18, line 48 - line 67 * * column 20, line 9 - column 21, line 47 * * column 22, line 65 - column 23, line 65 * * column 27, line 50 - column 28, line 37 *; | [I]US2011185016 (KANDASAMY DAVID RAJENDRAN [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]WO2013184653 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 12 - line 18 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 15 * * page 7, line 14 - line 26 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 23 *; | [I]US2014052851 (NIELSEN PATRICK MYLUND [SE]) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0095] * | International search | [A]US6144962 (WEINBERG AMIR [IL], et al) [A] 1-83* entire document *; | [A]US2005262104 (ROBERTSON NIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-83 * entire document *; | [A]US2006101155 (DAMOUR KEVIN T [US], et al) [A] 1-83 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012246310 (BRODA TAL [US], et al) [Y] 9, 10, 20-24, 72-75 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012311496 (CAO NAN [CN], et al) [Y] 4-7, 12, 13, 17, 18, 28, 30, 59-63, 65, 66, 70, 71, 79-81 * entire document *; | [XY]US8516590 (RANADIVE AMEET [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 8, 11, 14-16, 19, 25-27, 29, 31-58, 64, 67-69, 76-78, 82, 83 * entire document * [Y] 4-7, 9, 10, 12, 13, 17, 18, 20-24, 28, 30, 59-63, 65, 66, 70-75, 79-81; | [A]US2013227078 (WEI COACH [US], et al) [A] 1-83 * entire document *; | [PA]WO2016028771 (INFOTRUST LLC [US]) [PA] 1-83 * entire document * | by applicant | US5974572 | US2014052851 |