13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
16.09.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
08.10.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
01.10.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.07.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.05.2019 |
First examination report |
|
22.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
11.05.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
11.05.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
20.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
08.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
14.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
15.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|