Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10644814 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2020 | B2 | US2019334639 | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715555373 | 01.09.2017 | US201916504437 | 08.07.2019 | WO2016US20570 | 03.03.2016 | US201562128189 | 04.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10348424 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | B2 | US2018048402 | 15.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615555373 | 03.03.2016 | WO2016US20570 | 03.03.2016 | US201562128189 | 04.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3266128 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP3266128 | 24.10.2018 | A4 | EP3266128 | 10.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US20570 | 03.03.2016 | US201562128189 | 04.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016141120 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562128189 | 04.03.2015 |