Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018250445 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 | WO2016EP70482 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180050353 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 | WO2016EP70482 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107921176 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 | WO2016EP70482 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3344300 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 | WO2016EP70482 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018003226 | 25.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 | WO2016EP70482 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2018111492 | 04.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 | WO2016EP70482 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017037098 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016216414 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015216641 | 31.08.2015 |