EP3344300 - IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CeramTec GmbH CeramTec-Platz 1-9 73207 Plochingen / DE | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WECKER, Heinrich Am Mühlwehr 5a 90542 Eckental / DE | 02 /
KELNBERGER, Alfons Kantstrasse 93a 10627 Berlin / DE | 03 /
ZIERMANN, Frank Kottbusser Damm 33 10967 Berlin / DE | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
WECKER, Heinrich Am Mühlwehr 5a 90542 Eckental / DE | ||
02 /
KELNBERGER, Alfons Sudetenstr. 9 90552 Röthenbach / DE | |||
03 /
ZIERMANN, Frank Kottbusser Damm 33 10967 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Fehrenbacher, Eckhard Anton CeramTec GmbH CeramTec-Platz 1-9 73207 Plochingen / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16759747.5 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016EP70482 | Priority number, date | DE201510216641 | 31.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015216641 | [2018/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037098 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3344300 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/10, A61L27/12, A61L27/30, A61L27/32, A61L27/56 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/306 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/30 (KR);
A61L27/10 (KR);
A61L27/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30003 (KR);
A61F2002/30838 (KR);
A61F2002/30934 (KR);
A61L2420/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | IMPLANTATE | [2018/28] | English: | IMPLANTS | [2018/28] | French: | IMPLANTS | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 24.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2015082078 (CERAMTEC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 1 - line 6 * * page 5, line 4 - line 7 * * page 5, line 14 - line 24 * * page 6, line 14 - line 17 * * page 7, line 9 - line 15 * * claims 1-30 * |