Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107922789B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2021 | B | CN107922789 | 17.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP70610 | 01.09.2016 | EP15183469 | 02.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3344718 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2021 | B1 | EP3344718 | 11.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP70610 | 01.09.2016 | EP15183469 | 02.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2904621T | 05.04.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP70610 | 01.09.2016 | EP15183469 | 02.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017037170 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15183469 | 02.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3138886 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15183469 | 02.09.2015 |