EP3341611 - RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR WITH VENTED DISCHARGE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 17900 Beeline Highway Jupiter, FL 33478 / US | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLANIGAN, Paul J. Carrier Corporation PO Box 4808 Syracuse, New York 13221 / US | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/42] |
Former [2018/27] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16759940.6 | 25.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016US48518 | Priority number, date | US201562210105P | 26.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562210105 P | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017035289 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341611 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3341611 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/10, F04B53/06 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
F04B39/1066 (EP,US);
F04B39/0094 (US);
F04B39/10 (EP,US);
F04B39/1073 (EP,US);
F04B53/06 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1931 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTER MIT BELÜFTETEM AUSLASSVENTIL | [2020/24] | English: | RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR WITH VENTED DISCHARGE VALVE | [2018/27] | French: | COMPRESSEUR AVEC SOUPAPE D'ÉVACUATION VENTILÉ | [2020/24] |
Former [2018/27] | HUBKOLBENVERDICHTER MIT ENTLÜFTETEM AUSLASSVENTIL | ||
Former [2018/27] | COMPRESSEUR ALTERNATIF COMPRENANT UNE SOUPAPE DE DÉCHARGE À ÉVENT | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 15.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2016 | AL | 14.10.2020 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | IT | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | PL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MK | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4759692 (MORSE ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 9; figures 1,2 * [Y] 17,18 [I] 2-16; | [X]EP0949417 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2011005255 (TANIHATA TAKUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 17,18* claims 1,5,7 * |