EP3359792 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DRIVE DEVICE, AND DRIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATROHS, Bernhard Brunnenstrasse 27 73061 Ebersbach / DE | 02 /
BAREUTHER, Detlev Rauberweg 20 73249 Wernau / DE | 03 /
THEISS, Klaus Bachstrasse 98 72160 Altheim / DE | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16760059.2 | 01.09.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016EP70577 | Priority number, date | DE201510219337 | 07.10.2015 Original published format: DE102015219337 | [2018/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017060009 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359792 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, F02B37/12 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,KR,US);
B60W20/15 (US);
B60W10/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60W20/19 (EP);
F02B37/004 (EP,KR,US);
F02B37/013 (EP,KR,US);
F02B37/12 (EP,US);
F02B37/16 (EP,KR,US);
F02B37/18 (EP,US);
F02B37/24 (EP,KR,US);
B60K6/48 (US);
B60W2510/0633 (EP,US);
B60W2510/083 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (US);
B60W2710/0638 (US);
B60W2710/0666 (US);
B60W2710/083 (US);
B60Y2200/92 (US);
B60Y2400/435 (EP);
F02D2200/1002 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG, ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/33] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DRIVE DEVICE, AND DRIVE DEVICE | [2018/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION, SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 02.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102012201111 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0036] , [0037] * * paragraph [0044] * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]DE102013215536 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0013] , [0019] , [0020] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] * * figures 1,5 *; | [X]DE102012009288 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE10159801 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] * * figure 2 *; | [AD]DE102007012303 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] *; | [A]DE102011122442 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102009047054 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE102007012303 |