EP3341745 - BATTERY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Plc 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2022/08] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Oxis Energy Limited E1 Culham Science Centre Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KABACIK, Lukasz c/o Oxis Energy Limited E1 Culham Science Centre Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Bown, Mark Richard Johnson Matthey PLC Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 1 Belasis Avenue Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2018/27] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16760540.1 | 24.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016GB52631 | Priority number, date | GB20150015108 | 25.08.2015 Original published format: GB 201515108 | IT2015UB03222 | 25.08.2015 Original published format: IT UB20153222 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017033013 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341745 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3341745 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, H01M10/052, H01M10/48, H01M4/38, G01R31/382, G01R31/3842 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G01R31/382 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/392 (KR,US);
G01B7/18 (KR,US);
G01R27/20 (KR);
G01R31/3648 (KR);
G01R31/378 (KR,US);
G01R31/3842 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR,US);
H01M4/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/382 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/621 (KR,US);
H01M4/625 (KR,US);
H01M50/543 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | G01R31/36, H01M10/052, H01M10/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIESENSOR | [2018/27] | English: | BATTERY SENSOR | [2018/27] | French: | CAPTEUR DE BATTERIE | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 22.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 19.05.2021 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/46] | 03.01.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/46] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2016 | AL | 09.03.2022 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | IT | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | MK | 09.03.2022 | MT | 09.03.2022 | NL | 09.03.2022 | PL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | TR | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | IE | 24.08.2022 | LU | 24.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.08.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
TR | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 24.08.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 24.08.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.08.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
NO | 09.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006028172 (VAILLANCOURT JEAN-PIERRE [CA], et al); | [I]US2009315698 (BERDICHEVSKY EUGENE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [I]US2012105068 (WANG JOHN S [US], et al); | [X]US2012316814 (RAHAMAN AZIZUR [US], et al); | [XYI]US2013295424 (KNOEDGEN HORST [DE], et al) |