EP3338176 - WIDE VIEW IMAGE DISPLAY SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, AND IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWARA, Osamu c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
SUGIURA, Yoko c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16760805.8 | 10.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016JP03713 | Priority number, date | JP20150160512 | 17.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015160512 | JP20150160511 | 17.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015160511 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017029798 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338176 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G09G5/34, H04N5/232 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/1446 (EP,US);
G09G5/10 (US);
G09G5/34 (EP,US);
G09G5/38 (US);
H04N23/698 (EP,US);
H04N5/74 (US);
H04N9/3147 (EP);
H04N9/3185 (EP);
G09G2320/0626 (US);
G09G2320/066 (US);
G09G2340/0492 (US);
G09G2370/04 (EP,US);
G09G3/001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGESYSTEM MIT BREITEM SICHTFELD, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDANZEIGEVERFAHREN | [2018/26] | English: | WIDE VIEW IMAGE DISPLAY SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, AND IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD | [2018/26] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE À GRAND ANGLE, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 30.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB1190983 (SPITZ LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,3,15 * page 1, column left, line 9 - page 2, column left, line 30 * * page 13, column left, line 59 - page 14, column right, line 100; figures 28-33 * [I] 2,4-14; | [X]US5023725 (MCCUTCHEN DAVID [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 42 * * column 21, line 14 - column 21, line 50; figures 21-23 * * column 23, line 31 - column 25, line 59; figures 30-32 *; | [I]US2004207618 (WILLIAMS IAN M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0094]; figures 1, 3-5 ** paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0131]; figures 7G-7H *; | [I]US2009322740 (CARLSON KENNETH L [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1, 2, 23 * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0101]; figures 22, 23 *; | [I]US2010001997 (KAJIKAWA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0120]; figures 1-14 * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0136]; figures 16-25 * * paragraph [0164] - paragraph [0166]; figure 40 * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0208]; figures 53, 54, 58 *; | [I]US2013181901 (WEST KANYE OMARI [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-14 * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0089]; figures 18-25 * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095]; figures 30-33 * | by applicant | JP2008033138 | JP2013003327 | JP2013214947 | JP2015055827 |