Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108138949B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2020 | B | CN108138949 | 08.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562211145 | 28.08.2015 | US201615244033 | 23.08.2016 | WO2016US48320 | 24.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3341633 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | B1 | EP3341633 | 04.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562211145 | 28.08.2015 | US201615244033 | 23.08.2016 | WO2016US48320 | 24.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017040134 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562211145 | 28.08.2015 | US201615244033 | 23.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10066675 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2018 | B2 | US2017058968 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562211145 | 28.08.2015 | US201615244033 | 23.08.2016 |