EP3269349 - USE OF A TOPICALLY APPLIED COSMETIC COMPOSITION CONTAINING KERATIN AND SULPHUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/03] | TOPICALLY APPLIED COSMETIC REDUCTIVE COMPOSITION CONTAINING KERATIN AND SULPHUR | ||
[2020/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rodriguez Cerda, Patricio Alfredo El Retiro n° 5001 Oficina 6 Comuna de Vitacura, 7630000 Santiago / CL | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORALES MONTECINOS, Juan Pablo Pucará 5050 Dpto. 1305 Comuna de Ñuñoa 7790358 Santiago / CL | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ CERDA, Patricio Alfredo El Retiro n° 5001, oficina 6 Cummuna de Vitacura 7630000 Santiago / CL | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Lamas Menéndez, Pablo Avenida San Francisco Javier, No.9 PL 8 OF 7 41018 Sevilla / ES | [2018/03] | Application number, filing date | 16760991.6 | 29.02.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016CL00008 | Priority number, date | CL20152015593 | 11.03.2015 Original published format: CL 2015593 | [2018/03] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016141498 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269349 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3269349 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/23, A61Q19/06, A61K8/65 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/65 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/23 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/41 (US);
A61K8/42 (US);
A61K8/442 (US);
A61K8/463 (US);
A61K8/494 (US);
A61K8/602 (US);
A61K8/922 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q19/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/48 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/03] | A61K8/23, A61Q19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER TOPISCHAUFGETRAGENEN KOSMETISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND KERATIN UND SCHWEFEL | [2020/41] | English: | USE OF A TOPICALLY APPLIED COSMETIC COMPOSITION CONTAINING KERATIN AND SULPHUR | [2020/41] | French: | UTILISATON D'UNE COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE D'APPLICATION TOPIQUE COMPRENANT DE LA KÉRATINE ET DU SOUFRE | [2020/41] |
Former [2018/03] | TOPISCH AUFGETRAGENE KOSMETISCHE REDUKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KERATIN UND SCHWEFEL | ||
Former [2018/03] | TOPICALLY APPLIED COSMETIC REDUCTIVE COMPOSITION CONTAINING KERATIN AND SULPHUR | ||
Former [2018/03] | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE RÉDUCTRICE D'APPLICATION TOPIQUE QUI CONTIENT DE LA KÉRATINE ET DU SOUFRE | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2017 | Translation filed | 29.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 29.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.02.2016 | AL | 28.04.2021 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | PL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.02.2016 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.02.2016 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU3188868 (WARDENAAR) [X] 1,3,21-23,37,38 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013079373 (GELITA AG [DE]) [A] 1-38* the whole document *; | [X] - anonymous, "Milk & Honey Butter Blend", GNPD, MINTEL, (20100508), Database accession no. 1315115, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055522673 [X] 1,25,31,37,38 * the whole document * | [X] - anonymous, "Body Butter Blends for Hands, Feet & Body", GNPD, MINTEL, (20050630), Database accession no. 10224340, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055523032 [X] 1,25,31,37,38 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2003157194 (BASS RALPH L [US]) [A] 1-38 * , claims *; | [A]WO2009045556 (COPPOLA PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * , claims *; | [A]WO2010105636 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES UT AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-38 * , description *; | [A]WO2010105634 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES UT AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-38* , description * |