EP3270519 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR MOBILE NEAR FIELD PAYMENT AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Unionpay Co., Ltd Cup Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Yawei 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 02 /
FENG, Liang 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Guobao 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | 04 /
WAN, Sishuang 7th floor CUP Tower 36 Hanxiao Rd. Pudong new area Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2018/03] | Application number, filing date | 16761092.2 | 07.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016CN75757 | Priority number, date | CN201510105097 | 11.03.2015 Original published format: CN201510105097 | [2018/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016141865 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3270519 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00, H04B5/00, H04B5/02, G07F7/08, G07F19/00 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3278 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/327 (CN);
G06Q20/047 (EP,CN,KR);
G06Q20/20 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/206 (KR);
G06Q20/3223 (KR);
G06Q20/325 (CN,KR);
G06Q20/382 (KR);
H04B5/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/03] | H04B5/00, H04B5/02, G07F7/08, G07F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MOBILE NAHFELDZAHLUNG UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2018/03] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR MOBILE NEAR FIELD PAYMENT AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2018/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DESTINÉ À UN PAIEMENT MOBILE EN CHAMP PROCHE, ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | Translation filed | 07.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/37] | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006095212 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [I]US2013030933 (TALACH DAVID PAUL [US], et al); | [I]US2014019367 (KHAN AHMER A [US], et al); | International search | [A]CN101567108 (BEIJING AIAO SHIDAI INFORMATIO [CN]); | [A]CN101599191 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101867396 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN101958026 (YULONG COMP TELECOMM SCIENT); | [A]CN102271012 ; | [A]CN103218713 (SHANGHAI BASEWIN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN103679443 (CHINA UNIONPAY CO LTD); | [A]WO2014063546 (CHINA UNIONPAY CO LTD [CN]) |