EP3269428 - CONCEALED EXTENDABLE NOZZLE FOR GASEOUS FIRE SUPPRESSION SYSTEMS (VARIANTS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states "Pojtekhnika" Ltd 1-st Mytischinskaya Street 3 Moscow 129626 / RU | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHAZOVA, Natalya Viktorovna Scbakovskaya Street 58a, kb. 268 Moscow 105187 / RU | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Zahn, Matthias, et al Peter Bittner und Partner Herrenwiesenweg 2 69207 Sandhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Zahn, Matthias, et al Peter Bittner und Partner Seegarten 24 69190 Walldorf (Baden) / DE | Application number, filing date | 16762045.9 | 11.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016RU00136 | Priority number, date | RU20150108390 | 11.03.2015 Original published format: RU 2015108390 | [2018/03] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016144211 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | RU | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269428 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A62C31/02 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
A62C31/02 (EP,US);
A62C3/00 (EP,US);
A62C99/0018 (EP,US);
B05B1/005 (US);
B05B15/70 (EP,US);
B05B15/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Title | German: | VERBORGENE AUSZIEHBARE DÜSE FÜR GASFÖRMIGE FEUERUNTERDRÜCKUNGSSYSTEME (VARIANTEN) | [2018/03] | English: | CONCEALED EXTENDABLE NOZZLE FOR GASEOUS FIRE SUPPRESSION SYSTEMS (VARIANTS) | [2018/03] | French: | AJUTAGE CACHÉ ESCAMOTABLE DESTINÉ AUX APPAREILS D'EXTINCTION D'INCENDIES À GAZ (ET VARIANTES) | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2017 | Translation filed | 25.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 23.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 24.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB632713 (THOMPSON WILSON BURNAM, et al) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-8 ** page 4, lines 17-44 *; | [Y]US2699216 (ALDEN ALLEN) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-2 * * column 2, lines 1-45 *; | [Y]US3039536 (MICHAEL MOORE, et al) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, lines 6-12, 19-25 *; | [Y]EP0555147 (MOLIERE & FILS SARL ETS [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * column 2, lines 30-38,44-57 *; | [Y]JP2006255110 (KAWASAKI SAFETY SERVICE IND LTD) [Y] 1,2 * figure 4 * | International search | [AD]KR101321825B (HANKOOK FIRE EXTINGUISHER CO LTD [KR]) [AD] 1-2; | [A]RU2254156 (KAZANTSEV VLADIMIR GEORGIEVICH et al.) [A] 1-2; | [A]US2014138102 (CORN MAY L [US], et al) [A] 1-2; | [A]CN201406915Y (CHUANHUA PAN) [A] 1-2 |