EP3268009 - METHODS FOR MODULATING BONE DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 10 Hudson Yards, 37th FL New York, NY 10001 / US | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAPIRO, David P.O. Box 8530 5110 Via Avante Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
LUCIANO, Adorini Via Bronzino 8 20133 Milano / IT | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16762337.0 | 08.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016US21344 | Priority number, date | US201562130144P | 09.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562130144 P | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016144946 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3268009 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, A61P19/10, C07J9/00, C07J51/00 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/542 (US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/03] | A61K31/575, A61P19/10, C07J9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG DER KNOCHENDICHTE | [2018/03] | English: | METHODS FOR MODULATING BONE DENSITY | [2018/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE MODULATION DE LA DENSITÉ OSSEUSE | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 06.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03073991 (CELLTECH R & D INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-15 * abstract * * claim - *; | [X]JP2012072095 (TOKYO INST TECH, et al) [X] 1-3,10-15 * abstract * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2014184271 (TES PHARMA SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract ** claim - *; | [X] - SILVIA RUIZ-GASPÀ ET AL, "Ursodeoxycholic acid decreases bilirubin-induced osteoblast apoptosis", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, GB, (20141201), vol. 44, no. 12, doi:10.1111/eci.12355, ISSN 0014-2972, pages 1206 - 1214, XP055510885 [X] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 1212, column l, paragraph l - page 1213, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/eci.12355 | [X] - A Verma, "Ursodeoxycholic Acid Enhances Fractional Calcium Absorption in Primary Biliary Cirrhosis", Osteoporosis International, doi:https://doi.org/10.1007/s001980200092, (20020801), pages 677 - 682, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/s001980200092.pdf, (20180928), XP055510914 [X] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 681, column l, paragraphs 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/https://doi.org/10.1007/s001980200092 | [X] - MARTA DUBREUIL ET AL, "Ursodeoxycholic acid increases differentiation and mineralization and neutralizes the damaging effects of bilirubin on osteoblastic cells", LIVER INTERNATIONAL, GB, (20130801), vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1111/liv.12153, ISSN 1478-3223, pages 1029 - 1038, XP055510923 [X] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 1036, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1037, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/liv.12153 | [XY] - SUN WOOK CHO ET AL, "Positive regulation of osteogenesis by bile acid through FXR : POSITIVE REGULATION OF OSTEOGENESIS BY BILE ACID THROUGH FXR", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, US, (20131001), vol. 28, no. 10, doi:10.1002/jbmr.1961, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 2109 - 2121, XP055510907 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 2118; figure 7 * * page 2119, column r, paragraph l - page 2120, column l, paragraph l * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbmr.1961 | [Y] - K. KOWDLEY ET AL, "P374 LONG-TERM TREATMENT OF PRIMARY BILIARY CIRRHOSIS WITH THE FXR AGONIST OBETICHOLIC ACID SHOWS DURABLE EFFICACY", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140401), vol. 60, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0168-8278(14)60536-5, ISSN 0168-8278, pages S192 - S193, XP055511302 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-8278(14)60536-5 | [Y] - Hirschfield, "Efficacy of Obeticholic Acid in Patients With Primary Biliary Cirrhosis and Inadequate Response to Ursodeoxycholic Acid", Gastroenterology, United States, doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2014.12.005, (20141211), pages 751 - 761.e8, URL: file:///C:\Users\JG51779\AppData\Roaming\Mozilla\Firefox\Profiles\JG51779\CiteNPLTemp\CiteNPLWebPage.pdf, (20180928), XP055510903 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2014.12.005 | International search | [A]US2005107475 (JONES STACEY A [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 7, 9, 12-27* entire document *; | [A]US2008096921 (NAVAS FRANK III [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 7, 9, 12-27 * entire document *; | [A]WO2013192097 (INTERCEPT PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-4, 7, 9, 12-27 * entire document *; | [A]WO2014021694 (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 1-4, 7, 9, 12-27 * machine translation *; | [A]US2014371190 (PELLICCIARI ROBERTO [IT]) [A] 1-4, 7, 9, 12-27 * entire document * |