EP3267919 - SURGICAL ROBOTIC CART IMMOBILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICEMAN, Jason 515 Wood Hill Road Cheshire, Connecticut 06410 / US | 02 /
LATTIMORE, James 10 Alameda Drive Fairport, New York 14450 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 16762402.2 | 09.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016US21509 | Priority number, date | US201562131558P | 11.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562131558 P | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016145044 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3267919 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3267919 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, B60R25/20, B25J5/00, B60B33/00 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
B25J5/007 (EP,CN,US);
A61B34/20 (CN,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B90/50 (EP,US);
B60B33/0089 (EP,US);
A61B2090/508 (EP,US);
A61B50/13 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/03] | A61B34/20, B60R25/20, B25J5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEGFAHRSPERRE CHIRURGISCHE ROBOTERWAGEN | [2018/03] | English: | SURGICAL ROBOTIC CART IMMOBILIZER | [2018/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMMOBILISATION DE CHARIOT ROBOTIQUE CHIRURGICAL | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 10.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US7216399 (WEBSTER DERYL THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, paragraph 64 - column 3, line 2; figure 1 * [A] 2-8,10-12 [I] 9; | [A]DE202012007320U (NERGER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,9* paragraphs [0073] , [0074] , [0 97] - [0104]; figures 1,2, 8,9 *; | [E]EP3119332 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [E] 1,9 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] - [0038] - [0045]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]US4593883 (NELSON RICHARD P [US]) [X] 1, 14 * See column 2, line 45-column 3, line 7; and figure 1. *; | [X]US5323879 (POULIN WILLIE F [US]) [X] 1, 14 * See column 2, line 60-column 6, line 23; claims 1-6; and figures 1-5. *; | [XA]US7216399 (WEBSTER DERYL THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1 , 14, 21-26 * See column 1, line 64-column 2, line 32; column 3, lines 3-32; claims 1-24; and figures 1-4. * [A] 2-13, 15-20; | [A]US2011247173 (NGUYEN LONG Q [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0028]; claims 1-12; and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US8753009 (GREGERSON EUGENE A [US], et al) [A] 1-26* See the whole document. * | Examination | US6305659 |