EP3337934 - HANGER FOR BRACING PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MiTek Holdings, Inc. 802 West Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERT, David C. 1599 Highway 100 Pacific, MO63069 / US | 02 /
GANNON, Gary 13006 Ambois Drive Creve Coeur, MO 63141 / US | 03 /
O'REGAN, Philip 153 Inman Drive Decatur GA 30030-3831 / US | 04 /
SORRILL, Levi 1374 Dartmouth Court St. Charles, MO 63303 / US | 05 /
GALINSKI, John 1310 Bridlespur Lane Troy, IL 62294 / US | [2018/36] |
Former [2018/26] | 01 /
WERT, David C. 1599 Highway 100 Pacific, MO63069 / US | ||
02 /
GANNON, Gary 13006 Ambois Drive Creve Coeur, MO 63141 / US | |||
03 /
O'REGAN, Philip 41 Flower Hill Court St. Louis, MO 63122 / US | |||
04 /
SORRILL, Levi 1374 Dartmouth Court St. Charles, MO 63303 / US | |||
05 /
GALINSKI, John 1310 Bridlespur Lane Troy, IL 62294 / US | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Brand, Thomas Louis TL Brand & Co 17 Hanover Square London W1S 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 16763324.7 | 22.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016IB55008 | Priority number, date | US201514832176 | 21.08.2015 Original published format: US201514832176 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017033120 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337934 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/26, E04B7/02, F16B15/00, E04C3/02 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
E04B1/2608 (EP,US);
E04B1/388 (US);
E04B7/022 (EP,US);
F16B15/0046 (EP,US);
F16M13/02 (US);
E04B1/2612 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFHÄNGER FÜR VERSTEIFUNGSPLATTE | [2018/26] | English: | HANGER FOR BRACING PANEL | [2018/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION POUR PANNEAU DE RENFORT | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 21.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | EP18198505.2 / EP3444410 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1167779 (WIELAND ENGINEERING AG [CH]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0008]; figure 1 *[I] 1-8 | by applicant | US2015075107 |