EP3242496 - MULTIMEDIA CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE Holdings (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Room 1102, 10 Layer, Building 3 105 Yaojiayuan Road ChaoYang District Beijing 100025 / CN | For all designated states Le Shi Internet Information & Technology Corp., Beijing 10th Layer Letv Building No.105 Yeojiayuan Road ChaoYang District Beijing 100025 / CN | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yin 10th Layer Letv Building No.105 Yaojiayuan Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/45] | 01 /
LI, Yin 10th Layer Letv Building No.105 Yaojiayuan Road ChaoYang District Beijing 100025 / CN | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 16763712.3 | 04.07.2016 | [2017/45] | WO2016CN88486 | Priority number, date | CN20161161982 | 21.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610161982 | [2017/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161742 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242496 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04M1/725, H04W64/00, G06F3/01 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/021 (CN);
H04N21/42202 (US);
G06F3/01 (CN);
H04M1/72457 (CN);
H04W4/023 (CN);
H04W52/0254 (EP);
H04W52/028 (EP);
H04W64/00 (CN);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MULTIMEDIASTEUERUNG | [2017/45] | English: | MULTIMEDIA CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2017/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE MULTIMÉDIA | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2016 | Translation filed | 22.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 22.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010042235 (BASSO ANDREA [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0046] *; | [X]US2010130213 (VENDROW VLAD [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] *; | [X]US2013238700 (PAPAKIPOS MATTHEW NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0 33] - [0036] *; | [X]US2013260795 (PAPAKIPOS MATTHEW NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0027] - [0039] * | International search | CN1350373 [a] (YOULUOKE AUTOMATION INSTR CO L [CN]) [a] 1-11 * the whole document *; | US2005192025 [a] (KAPLAN RICHARD D [US]) [a] 1-11* the whole document *; | CN1913473 [a] (ZHANG YU [CN]) [a] 1-11 * the whole document *; | CN101478720 [a] (MEIHUA CAO [CN]) [a] 1-11 * the whole document *; | CN102685666 [x] (SHENZHEN SDMC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [x] 1-11; | CN105222802 [a] (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [a] 1-11 * the whole document * |