EP3356488 - NON-REACTIVE HOT-MELT ADHESIVE WITH SPECIFIC RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PURAC Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEKENS, Chris Francois Hubert C/O IP Department PURAC Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | 02 /
GOBIUS DU SART, Gerrit C/O IP Department PURAC Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | 03 /
BRAAM, Kevin Bernardus C/O IP Department PURAC Biochem BV Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16763766.9 | 08.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016EP71143 | Priority number, date | EP20150187977 | 01.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15187977 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017055045 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3356488 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3356488 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09J167/00, C09J167/04, C08L67/00, C08L67/04 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
C09J167/04 (EP,EA,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,EA,US);
C08G63/08 (US);
C09J167/02 (EA,US);
C09J5/00 (EA,US);
C09J5/06 (EA,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J167/04, C08L67/04, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTREAKTIVER SCHMELZKLEBSTOFF, DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2021/20] | English: | NON-REACTIVE HOT-MELT ADHESIVE WITH SPECIFIC RESIN | [2018/32] | French: | ADHÉSIF THERMOFUSIBLE NON RÉACTIF, SA FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2021/20] |
Former [2018/32] | NICHTREAKTIVER SCHMELZKLEBSTOFF MIT SPEZIFISCHEM HARZ | ||
Former [2018/32] | ADHÉSIF THERMOFUSIBLE NON RÉACTIF AVEC RÉSINE SPÉCIFIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 26.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2016 | AL | 10.11.2021 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5252642 (SINCLAIR RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * examples 1,4 *; | [YA]US5753724 (EDGINGTON GARRY J [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-12,14 * column 1, lines 11-20 * * column 3, lines 8-12; claims 1,4; tables I,1 * [A] 2,13; | [YA]WO2005056680 (BIOMET DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3-12,14 * page 1, lines 3-6; examples 1-3 *[A] 2,13; | [A]WO2008044651 (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 3; table 1 *; | [A]US2009234042 (LUINSTRA GERRIT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0039] , [0083] , [0084]; examples 1,9-11; claim 19 * | by applicant | US5252642 | US5753724 | WO2005056680 | WO2008044651 | US2009234042 |