Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
16.10.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.05.2018 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 | Change - extension states | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
10.02.2018 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 | Change - classification | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 | Change - classification | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
12.01.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.12.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
28.12.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
28.12.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
28.11.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.11.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.10.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.09.2017 | Change - representative | |
12.09.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication |