Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018106236 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150037432 | 18.03.2015 | WO2016KR01905 | 26.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018508712 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150037432 | 18.03.2015 | WO2016KR01905 | 26.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107407250 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150037432 | 18.03.2015 | WO2016KR01905 | 26.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3273050 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2018 | A4 | EP3273050 | 24.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150037432 | 18.03.2015 | WO2016KR01905 | 26.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016148412 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150037432 | 18.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101599708B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150037432 | 18.03.2015 |