EP3268019 - COMPOSITIONS THAT METABOLIZE OR SEQUESTER FREE SUGAR MONOMERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infinant Health, Inc 2121 2nd Street Suite B107 Davis, CA 95618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | For all designated states Infinant Health, Inc 2121 2nd Street Suite B107 Davis, California 95618 / US | ||
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Evolve Biosystems, Inc. 2121 2nd Street, Suite B107 Davis CA 95618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KYLE, David 3603 Mono Place Davis, California 95618 / US | 02 /
MILLS, David 1703 Colorado Lane Davis, California 95616 / US | 03 /
LEBRILLA, Carlito 3035 Mallorca Lane Davis, California 95618 / US | 04 /
FREEMAN-SHARKEY, Samara 5248 Hamel Street Davis, California 95618 / US | 05 /
FRESE, Steven 222 D Street, Apt. 7 Davis, California 95616 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Henderson, Helen Lee Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Henderson, Helen Lee Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16765525.7 | 11.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016US22226 | Priority number, date | US201562133239P | 13.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562133239 P | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016149149 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3268019 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61K31/702, A61P1/14, A23K50/20, A23K50/30, A23K50/60, A23L33/125, A23L33/135, A23L33/21, A23L33/00, A61K31/7004, A61K31/7012, A61K35/744, A61K35/747, A61K9/19, A23K10/18, A61K35/745, A61K9/16 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A23K10/18 (EP,US);
A61K35/745 (EP,CN,US);
A61K35/744 (US);
A23K50/20 (EP,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,US);
A23K50/60 (EP,US);
A23L33/125 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/7004 (EP,US);
A61K31/7012 (EP,US);
A61K35/74 (EP,US);
A61K35/741 (CN);
A61K35/747 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P1/14 (EP,CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7004, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7012, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/741, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K35/745, A61K2300/00 (CN); |
Former IPC [2018/03] | A61K35/74, A61K31/702, A61P1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERSTOFFWECHSELUNG ODER SEQUESTRIERUNG VON FREIEN ZUCKERMONOMEREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/03] | English: | COMPOSITIONS THAT METABOLIZE OR SEQUESTER FREE SUGAR MONOMERS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS QUI MÉTABOLISENT OU PIÈGENT LES MONOMÈRES GLUCIDIQUES LIBRES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 14.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]RU2180915 ; | [XI]US5716615 (CAVALIERE VESELY RENATA MARIA [IT], et al) [X] 1-14,16-18 * column 1, lines 11-18, paragraph l; claim 8 * [I] 1-14,16-18; | [XI]UA32462U (UNIV KHARKIV NAT MEDICAL [UA]) [X] 15 * abstract * [I] 15; | [XI]US2011165127 (MASRI FABIOLA [CA]) [X] 1-4,6-13,16,17 * paragraph [0002]; figure 7; example 9 * [I] 1-14,16-18; | [XI]US2012207712 (LONGONI VALERIA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4-14,16-18 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0 19]; examples 1, 4; claim 1 * [I] 1-14,16-18; | [XI]US2012315249 (OLMSTEAD STEPHEN F [US]) [X] 1-4,6-13,16,17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003]; example 2 * [I] 1-14,16-18; | [E]WO2016094836 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [E] 1,2,6-9,13,15,16 * claims 1-4, 21-24 *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 36, Database accession no. 2002-327485, XP002784757 & RU2180915 C1 20020327 (MOSC EPIDEMIOLOGY & MICROBIOLOGY INST) [X] 1-4,6-13,16,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 15] - [0028] - [0 44] - [0049] * [I] 1-14,16-18 | [I] - MUIREANN EGAN ET AL, "Metabolism of Sialic Acid by Bifidobacterium breve UCC2003", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20140509), vol. 80, no. 14, doi:10.1128/AEM.01114-14, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 4414 - 4426, XP055506861 [I] 1-18 * abstract * * page 4415, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 4424, column l, paragraphs 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.01114-14 | [A] - KATHARINE M. NG ET AL, "Microbiota-liberated host sugars facilitate post-antibiotic expansion of enteric pathogens", NATURE, GB, (20130901), vol. 502, no. 7469, doi:10.1038/nature12503, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 96 - 99, XP055506735 [A] 1-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature12503 | International search | [XY]WO2007046697 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-2, 3/1-2, 4/3/1-2, 5/4/3/1-2 * ; page 9, third paragraph; page 11, third - ' fourth paragraphs; page 12, first - second paragraphs * [Y] 6/5/4/3/1-2; | [EY]WO2016065324 (EVOLVE BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [EY] 1-2, 3/1-2, 4/3/1-2, 5/4/3/1-2, 6/5/4/3/1-2, 49-51* ; entire document *; | [XY] - DE LEOZ, MLA et al., "Human Milk Glycomics and Gut Microbial Genomics in Infant Feces Show a Correlation between Human Milk Oligosaccharides and Gut Microbiota: A Proof-of-Concept Study.", Journal of Proteome Research., (20141010), vol. 14, pages 491 - 502, XP055311152 [X] 49 * ; abstract; 498, first column, second paragraph; Figures 1A, 7A; Table 1. DOI: 10.1021/pr500759e * [Y] 50-51 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/pr500759e | [Y] - UNDERWOOD, MA et al., "Bifidobacterium longum Subspecies infantis: Champion Colonizer of the Infant Gut.", Pediatric Research., (20141105), vol. 77, pages 229 - 235, XP055311157 [Y] 6/5/4/3/1-2, 50-51 * ; abstract; page 2, third paragraph. DOI: 10.1038/pr.2014.156 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/pr.2014.156 |