EP3270815 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ONSCREEN IDENTIFICATION OF INSTRUMENTS IN A TELEOPERATIONAL MEDICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITKOWITZ, Brandon D. 834 Maria Lane Apartment 1050 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
MOHR, Paul W. 301 Monroe Drive Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/18] |
Former [2018/04] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16765642.0 | 16.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016US22612 | Priority number, date | US201562134297P | 17.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562134297 P | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016149345 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3270815 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3270815 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/35, A61B34/37, A61B90/94, // A61B17/29, B25J9/16 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
A61B34/35 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B34/25 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/74 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B90/08 (KR);
A61B90/37 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B90/94 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B25J13/06 (CN,US);
B25J19/023 (CN,US);
B25J9/1674 (CN,US);
B25J9/1682 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | A61B34/35, A61B34/37, A61B17/29, B25J9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON INSTRUMENTEN AUF EINEM BILDSCHIRM IN EINEM TELEOPERATIVEN MEDIZINISCHEN SYSTEM | [2018/04] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ONSCREEN IDENTIFICATION OF INSTRUMENTS IN A TELEOPERATIONAL MEDICAL SYSTEM | [2018/04] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION SUR ÉCRAN D'INSTRUMENTS DANS UN SYSTÈME MÉDICAL DE TÉLÉOPÉRATION | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 11.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23154062.6 / EP4190268 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 10.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008002830 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL INC [US]); | [XI]US2014055489 (ITKOWITZ BRANDON D [US], et al); | [XI]WO2014160086 (FARRITOR SHANE [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5825982 (WRIGHT JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2004046711 (TRIEBFUERST GUNTHARD [DE]); | [A]US2009036902 (DIMAIO SIMON P [US], et al); | [A]US2011306986 (LEE MIN KYU [KR], et al); | [XA]US2014055489 (ITKOWITZ BRANDON D [US], et al); | [A]WO2014160086 (FARRITOR SHANE [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008002830 | US2014055489 |