EP3271005 - SYNERGISTIC REGULATED CELL DEATH INDUCTION WITH HSP90 INHIBITORS AND NANOSECOND PULSED ELECTRIC FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Old Dominion University IRP-1 4111 Monarch Way Room 2303 Norfolk, VA 23508 / US | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEEBE, Stephen, J. 6154 Westwood Terrace Norfolk, VA 23508 / US | 02 /
CATRAVAS, John, D. 3776 Jefferson Boulevard Virginia Beach, VA 23508 / US | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16765808.7 | 18.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016US23043 | Priority number, date | US201562135466P | 19.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562135466 P | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016149575 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271005 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/36, A61N1/04, A61K45/06, A61N1/32, A61K31/395, A61P35/00 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
A61N1/36002 (EP,US);
A61K31/395 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61N1/0412 (EP,US);
A61N1/327 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | REGULIERTE SYNERGISTISCHE ZELLTODINDUZIERUNG MIT HSP90-INHIBITOREN UND NANOSEKUNDENGEPULSTEN ELEKTRISCHEN FELDERN | [2018/04] | English: | SYNERGISTIC REGULATED CELL DEATH INDUCTION WITH HSP90 INHIBITORS AND NANOSECOND PULSED ELECTRIC FIELDS | [2018/04] | French: | INDUCTION SYNERGIQUE DE MORT CELLULAIRE RÉGULÉE À L'AIDE D'INHIBITEURS DE HSP90 ET DE CHAMPS ÉLECTRIQUES À IMPULSIONS NANOSECONDES | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 18.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010247562 (GONG JIANLIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2014358066 (NUCCITELLI RICHARD LEE [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0017], [0024], [0026], [0035], [0164]; claims 1, 4 *; | [Y]US2014371158 (CHADLI AHMED [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0054], [0074], [0078], [0083], [0132], [0133], [0143] *; | [Y]WO2009138542 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES], et al) [Y] 1, 8 * ; abstract; page page 8, paragraph 4, paragraph 6; claim 13 *; | [Y]US2011124104 (GUDKOV ANDREI [US], et al) [Y] 10 * ; abstract; paragraph [0200] * |