EP3354009 - PHASE DETECTION AUTOFOCUS ARITHMETIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALOR GLUSKIN, Micha 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
VELARDE, Ruben Manuel 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LEE, Jisoo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16766705.4 | 24.08.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016US48414 | Priority number, date | US201514865629 | 25.09.2015 Original published format: US201514865629 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017052923 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354009 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3354009 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/28, G02B7/34, G02B7/36, H04N5/232, H04N5/369, H01L27/146, H04N9/04 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
G02B7/285 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/34 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/365 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14621 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14627 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/672 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/843 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/134 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/704 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | H04N5/232, H01L27/146, H04N5/369, H04N9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARITHMETIK FÜR PHASENDETEKTIONSAUTOFOKUS | [2018/31] | English: | PHASE DETECTION AUTOFOCUS ARITHMETIC | [2018/31] | French: | ARITHMÉTIQUE DE MISE AU POINT AUTOMATIQUE À DÉTECTION DE PHASE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 25.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 16.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2016 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.08.2016 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0981245 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]JP2007103590 (NIKON CORP); | [A]US2009225217 (KATSUDA YASUTOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012033120 (NAKAMURA KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012168246 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]US2013335608 (KONO SHOJI [JP]); | [A]EP2738812 (CMOSIS NV [BE]); | [XI]EP2882183 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |