EP3353612 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRICAL DRIVE, AND ELECTRICAL DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHUNK Electronic Solutions GmbH Am Tannwald 17 78112 St. Georgen / DE | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELLHAUER, Bruno Wilhelmstrasse 37 74336 Brackenheim / DE | 02 /
HÖPFL, Sebastian Zehntgasse 14 74211 Leingarten / DE | 03 /
KHOURY, Jakob Flösserstrasse 41 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 04 /
DIETERLE, Franz Bachstrasse 20 77761 Schiltach / DE | 05 /
HEILMANN, Matthias Weissdornweg 12 78126 Königsfeld / DE | 06 /
RUGGIERI, Patrick Eschweg 2 78647 Trossingen / DE | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16766969.6 | 19.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016EP72136 | Priority number, date | DE201510218203 | 22.09.2015 Original published format: DE102015218203 | [2018/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017050683 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3353612 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3353612 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/19, G05B19/416 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
G05B19/19 (EP,US);
H02P25/06 (US);
G05B19/416 (EP,US);
H02K41/02 (US);
G05B2219/43071 (EP,US);
G05B2219/43074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN ANTRIEBS SOWIE ELEKTRISCHER ANTRIEB | [2018/31] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRICAL DRIVE, AND ELECTRICAL DRIVE | [2018/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE AINSI QU'ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 14.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | GB | 19.09.2023 | IE | 19.09.2023 | LU | 19.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 28.12.2022 | |
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4999551 (YOSHIDA YUKIO [JP], et al) [I] 1,10 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 37 ** column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 37; figure 9 *; | [Y]EP0548505 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [Y] 5-7 * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 9 *; | [IY]EP0793157 (NABCO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-4,8-14 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 56 * * column 14, line 37 - column 18, line 40; figure 4 * [Y] 5-7; | [I]EP0804672 (HOERMANN KG VERKAUFSGES [DE]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0027] * | Examination | EP0804672 | by applicant | DE102005010089 | DE10333067 |