EP3341314 - SPRING CASSETTE FOR A CABLE OR TUBE WINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conductix Wampfler France Immeuble West Plaza 9, rue du Débarcadère 92700 Colombes / FR | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Jean-Michel 407, Rue de Gotraz 01300 BRENS / FR | 02 /
PARSEIHIAN, Bruno 61 impasse de l'Eglise 01300 Magnieu / FR | [2018/39] |
Former [2018/27] | 01 /
BERGER, Jean-Michel 7 Grande Rue 01300 Belley / FR | ||
02 /
PARSEIHIAN, Bruno 61 impasse de l'Eglise 01300 Magnieu / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 87 rue de Sèze 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16766999.3 | 26.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016FR52131 | Priority number, date | FR20150057964 | 27.08.2015 Original published format: FR 1557964 | [2018/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017032956 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341314 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3341314 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/48, H02G11/02, // H02G3/08 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
B65H75/486 (EP);
H02G11/02 (EP);
H02G3/086 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | B65H75/48, H02G11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEDERKASSETTE FÜR EINEN KABEL- ODER ROHRWICKLER | [2018/27] | English: | SPRING CASSETTE FOR A CABLE OR TUBE WINDER | [2018/27] | French: | CASSETTE A RESSORT POUR UN ENROULEUR DE CABLE OU DE TUYAU | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2016 | AL | 11.03.2020 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | CZ | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | IE | 26.08.2020 | LU | 26.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3040139 (APPLETON ARTHUR I) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 45 * * figures 1,5 *; | [Y]EP1467457 (IPALCO BV [NL]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] ** figures 1,4 * |