EP3344284 - IMMUNE CELL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADUSUMILLI, Prasad, S. 530 East 76th Street Apt. 27k New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
SADELAIN, Michel 15 West 84th Str 2C New York, NY 10024 / US | [2019/34] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
ADUSUMILLI, Prasad, S. 530 East 76th Street Apt. 27k New York, NY 10021 / US | ||
02 /
SADELAIN, Michel 444 Central Park West 8h New York, NY 10025 / US | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16767094.2 | 02.09.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016US50128 | Priority number, date | US201562214809P | 04.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562214809 P | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017040945 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3344284 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K35/17, C07K14/705, C07K14/725, C12N5/0783 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K2239/46 (EP,US);
A61K2239/55 (EP,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61K38/193 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K38/4873 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/464402 (EP,US);
A61K39/464411 (EP,US);
A61K39/464468 (EP,US);
A61K39/464495 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/70503 (EP,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP,US);
C07K14/70521 (EP,US);
C07K14/70578 (US);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
C12N5/0638 (EP,US);
C12N9/6472 (EP,US);
C12Y304/22062 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/193, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | IMMUNZELLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2018/28] | English: | IMMUNE CELL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2018/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE CELLULES IMMUNITAIRES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 02.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2013019615 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [E]WO2016138846 (SHANGHAI SIDANSAI BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | by applicant | US4956778 | US5091513 | US5132405 | US5399346 | US2005196754 | US7446190 | US8357783 | US2013071414 | WO2014055668 | US8802374 | WO2015188141 |