|
18.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
123 |
|
18.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2022 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2022 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
151 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
180 |
|
02.02.2017 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
54 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
118 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
54 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |