Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022112263 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US50128 | 02.09.2016 | US201815757276 | 02.03.2018 | US201562214809 | 04.09.2015 | US202117557607 | 21.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11242375 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B2 | US2018273601 | 27.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US50128 | 02.09.2016 | US201562214809 | 04.09.2015 | US201615757276 | 02.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2997551 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US50128 | 02.09.2016 | US201562214809 | 04.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016316033B | Global Dossier | 03.03.2022 | B2 | AU2016316033 | 12.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US50128 | 02.09.2016 | US201562214809 | 04.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3344284 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US50128 | 02.09.2016 | US201562214809 | 04.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1258041 | 01.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US50128 | 02.09.2016 | US201562214809 | 04.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017040945 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562214809 | 04.09.2015 |