EP3341033 - CLEANING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE, MEDICAL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A CLEANING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Winter & Ibe GmbH Kuehnstraße 61 22045 Hamburg / DE | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTTENS, Benjamin Fuhlsbüttler Straße 466 22309 Hamburg / DE | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16767141.1 | 01.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016EP68342 | Priority number, date | DE201510216445 | 27.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015216445 | [2018/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017032561 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3341033 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, A61B90/70, A61L2/24 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
A61L2/18 (EP);
A61B90/70 (EP);
A61L2/24 (EP);
A61B2090/701 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP);
A61L2202/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGS- UND DESINFEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG, MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER REINIGUNGS- UND DESINFEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2018/27] | English: | CLEANING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE, MEDICAL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A CLEANING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE ET DE DÉSINFECTION, SYSTÈME MÉDICAL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE ET DE DÉSINFECTION | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 09.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1121942 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 27]; figures 3, 4 *; | [X]EP1550465 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [X]EP1600173 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraph [0042] *; | [X]US2009220377 (HASEGAWA HITOSHI [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraphs [0076] , [0 77] *; | [X]JP2010110417 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-6,11,12 * abstract *; | [X]DE102010002031 (KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * abstract *; | [X]US2012249060 (STODDARD ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11,12 * abstract *; | [I]WO2012148868 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) [I] 1-6,11,12 * page 18, paragraph 3 * * page 11, lines 30-32 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2014205366 (NOSOCOM SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraph [0057] *; | [X]WO2015040366 (TRISTEL PLC [GB]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * page 7, lines 6-9; figure 1; claims 6,7 * * page 8, lines 16-23 *; | [XP]WO2016006270 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-6,11,12* paragraphs [0077] - [0079] *; | [XP]US2016081540 (SUZUKI SHINTARO [JP]) [XP] 1-6,11,12 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 34]; figure 1 *; | [XP]WO2016087244 (WINTER & IBE OLYMPUS [DE]) [XP] 1-6,11,12 * abstract * * page 17, lines 21, 22 * * page 18, paragraph 2 * |