EP3365214 - CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innova Patent GmbH Konrad-Doppelmayr-Strasse 1 6922 Wolfurt / AT | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTTERLUETY, Andreas Unterstein 369 6863 Egg / AT | 02 /
SUTTER, Josef Fluh 16 6900 Bregenz / AT | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16767320.1 | 21.09.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016EP72444 | Priority number, date | AT20150000677 | 19.10.2015 Original published format: AT 6772015 | [2018/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017067731 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365214 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3365214 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/12 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
B61B12/122 (EP,AT,KR,US);
B61B12/12 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 15.05.2018 | Title | German: | KLEMME | [2018/35] | English: | CLAMP | [2018/35] | French: | PINCE | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 15.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2016 | AL | 03.08.2022 | BG | 03.08.2022 | CY | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | MK | 03.08.2022 | MT | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | IE | 21.09.2022 | LU | 21.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | GB | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
BG | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
GB | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
GB | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
GB | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
GB | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
GB | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | HR | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | HR | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 03.08.2022 | |
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 03.08.2022 | |
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0132721 (INST NAT POLYTECH GRENOBLE [FR]); | [XI]FR2675451 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]); | [A]EP0621163 (DOPPELMAYR & SOHN [AT]); | [A]CN104787054 (BEIJING ZHONGSUOGUOYOU ROPEWAY ENGINEERING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | Examination | JPH03292252 |