Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9903706 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2018 | B2 | US2017307356 | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB55190 | 31.08.2016 | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018507384 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2018 | A | JP6291630B | 14.03.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB55190 | 31.08.2016 | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107532876 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB55190 | 31.08.2016 | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2961234 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2018 | C | CA2961234 | 02.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB55190 | 31.08.2016 | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3191790 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | B1 | EP3191790 | 19.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB55190 | 31.08.2016 | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017003668 | 31.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB55190 | 31.08.2016 | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3191790T | 29.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IB55190 | 31.08.2016 | EP16767365 | 31.08.2016 | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017093815 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1023160 | 05.12.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE038948T | 28.12.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | BE201505778 | 02.12.2015 |