EP3344186 - BIODEGRADABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR BREAST RECONSTRUCTION AND/OR AUGMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tensive S.r.l. Viale Ortles 22/4 20139 Milano / IT | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERGES, Irini c/o Tensive S.r.l. c/o Fondazione Filarete Viale Ortles 22/4 20139 Milano / IT | 02 /
MARTELLO, Federico c/o Tensive S.r.l. c/o Fondazione Filarete Viale Ortles 22/4 20139 Milano / IT | 03 /
TAMPLENIZZA, Margherita c/o Tensive S.r.l. c/o Fondazione Filarete Viale Ortles 22/4 20139 Milano / IT | 04 /
TOCCHIO, Alessandro c/o Tensive S.r.l. c/o Fondazione Filarete Viale Ortles 22/4 20139 Milano / IT | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16767367.2 | 01.09.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016IB55238 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB03348 | 02.09.2015 Original published format: IT UB20153348 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037649 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3344186 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3344186 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/12, A61L27/00 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
A61F2/12 (EP,IL,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,IL,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,IL,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,IL,US);
C08G18/3206 (US);
C08G18/42 (US);
C08G18/48 (US);
C08G18/73 (US);
C08G18/755 (US);
C08L75/02 (IL);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0071 (EP,US);
A61F2240/002 (EP,US);
A61L2430/04 (EP,IL,US);
B29C39/003 (US);
B29K2075/00 (US);
B29K2105/04 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L75/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BRUSTREKONSTRUKTION UND/ODER -VERGRÖSSERUNG | [2018/28] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR BREAST RECONSTRUCTION AND/OR AUGMENTATION | [2018/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL BIODÉGRADABLE POUR AUGMENTATION ET/OU RECONSTRUCTION MAMMAIRE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 15.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 01.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006010278 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1-6 *; | [Y]WO2009097347 (EVERA MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0077]; figures 14,15 *; | [A]KR20090101955 (IMPLITE LTD [IL]) [A] 1-17* figure 1a *; | [A]US2011029077 (CHOI JONG-SOO [KR]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0030]; figures 7,8 * | by applicant | WO9006094 | US2005013793 | CA2574933 | US2006069435 | US2008261306 | US2013295081 | - TAMPLENIZZA ET AL., MOL IMAGING, (20150501), vol. 14, pages 11 - 21 | - ZHANG ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (201507), pages 68 - 77 | - TOCCHIO ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (201503), vol. 45, pages 124 - 131 | - ZHI-XIANG ET AL., CHINESE JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE., (2014), vol. 32, no. 7, pages 864 - 870 | - PATRI K. VENUVINOD; WEIYIN MA, "Selective Laser Sintering (SLS", RAPID PROTOTYPING, (2004), pages 245 - 277 | - MELCHELS FPW; DOMINGOS MAN; KLEIN TJ; MALDA J; BARTOLO PJ; HUTMACHER DW., "Additive manufacturing of tissues and organs", PROG. POLYM. SCI., (2012), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2011.11.007, pages 1079 - 1104, XP028927993 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2011.11.007 |