29.01.2021 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
27.01.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
06.12.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.09.2019 |
First examination report |
|
14.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.05.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
12.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
12.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
25.05.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
15.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
29.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
04.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
18.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|