EP3276525 - IMAGE FILE DISTRIBUTION DEVICE, IMAGE FILE RESTORATION DEVICE, METHOD AND PROGRAM THEREFOR, AND RECORDING MEDIUM IN WHICH PROGRAM IS STORED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAMOTO, Kentaro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 7-3 Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 16768504.9 | 14.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016JP57909 | Priority number, date | JP20150058907 | 23.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015058907 | [2018/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016152601 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276525 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3276525 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, G06F12/00, G06F21/60, G09C1/00, H04L9/08, G06F3/06, G09C5/00, G16H30/20, G16H10/60 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/065 (US);
G06F12/00 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/0643 (US);
G06F3/067 (US);
G09C1/00 (EP,US);
G09C5/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | G06F21/62, G06F12/00, G06F21/60, G09C1/00, G06F19/00, H04L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDDATEIVERTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDDATEIWIEDERHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR SOWIE AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DARAUF GESPEICHERTEM PROGRAMM | [2018/05] | English: | IMAGE FILE DISTRIBUTION DEVICE, IMAGE FILE RESTORATION DEVICE, METHOD AND PROGRAM THEREFOR, AND RECORDING MEDIUM IN WHICH PROGRAM IS STORED | [2018/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE FICHIER IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE RESTAURATION DE FICHIER IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIÉS, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DANS LEQUEL UN PROGRAMME EST STOCKÉ | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2017 | Translation filed | 20.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 20.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2016 | AL | 11.12.2019 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | ES | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | IT | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | GB | 14.03.2020 | IE | 14.03.2020 | LU | 14.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | FR | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.03.2016 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IE | 14.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014078755 (AWARE INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 10 - page 11 *; | [Y] - Jay J Wylie ET AL, "Selecting the Right Data Distribution Scheme for a Survivable Storage System (CMU-CS-01-120)", (20010101), URL: http://repository.cmu.edu/cgi/viewcontent.cgi?article=3163&context=compsci, (20171130), XP055430886 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * table 1 * | [A] - KURIHARA J ET AL, "A Fast (k, L, n)-Threshold Ramp Secret Sharing Scheme", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS,COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, ENGINEERING SCIENCES SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20090801), vol. E92A, no. 8, doi:10.1587/TRANSFUN.E92.A.1808, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 1808 - 1821, XP001548364 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1587/transfun.E92.A.1808 | International search | [A]JP2003132234 (GLOBAL FRIENDSHIP INC) [A] 1-17* , paragraphs [0028] to [0030]; fig. 2 & WO 2003/036538 A1 *; | [A]JP2007189345 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-17 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0031] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011248711 (NOMURA RES INST LTD) [A] 1-17 * , paragraphs [0084] to [0086], [0092] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012010052 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-17 * , paragraphs [0082] to [0085], [0095], [0200] to [0205]; fig. 18, 24 & US 2011/0317839 A1 paragraphs [0118] to [0121], [0131], [0237] to [0242]; fig. 18, 24 & CN 102299799 A *; | [A]JP2014075778 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-17 * , paragraph [0086]; fig. 3 & US 2014/0079322 A1 paragraph [0123]; fig. 3 & CN 103678445 A *; | [A] - YASUSHI MATSUMURA, "Denshi Karte Bunsho no Himitsu Bunsan Gaibu Hozon no Kento", Japan Journal of Medical Information, (20131123), vol. 33, pages 110 - 113, XP009501287 [A] 1-17 | [A] - KOHEI HORIUCHI, "MyCloud: A Secret Sharing Storage System Combining Several Vendors' Data Cloud Services", Information Processing Society of Japan Symposium, Programming · Symposium Fuyu 51 Kai, (20100112), pages 161 - 164, XP 055420711 [A] 1-17 |