EP3276336 - MICROSPECTROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jasco Corporation 2967-5 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIZAWA, Kento c/o JASCO Corporation 2967-5 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Tsutomu c/o JASCO Corporation 2967-5 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | 03 /
USUKI, Masateru c/o JASCO Corporation 2967-5 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8537 / JP | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2022/49] |
Former [2018/05] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16768726.8 | 22.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016JP58889 | Priority number, date | JP20150062307 | 25.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015062307 | [2018/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016152823 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276336 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3276336 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/28, G01J3/02, G01J3/06, G01J3/08, G01N21/65, G02B21/00, G01J3/10, G01J3/44, G01N21/64, G01N21/59 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,US);
G01J3/027 (EP,US);
G01J3/06 (EP,US);
G01J3/08 (US);
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
G01J3/44 (US);
G02B21/0036 (EP,US);
G02B21/0064 (US);
G01J3/0256 (US);
G01J3/10 (US);
G01J3/2803 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | G01N21/65 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROSPEKTROSKOP | [2018/05] | English: | MICROSPECTROSCOPE | [2018/05] | French: | MICROSPECTROSCOPE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2017 | Translation filed | 21.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 21.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.12.2022 | AT | 07.12.2022 | CZ | 07.12.2022 | DK | 07.12.2022 | EE | 07.12.2022 | ES | 07.12.2022 | FI | 07.12.2022 | HR | 07.12.2022 | IT | 07.12.2022 | LT | 07.12.2022 | LV | 07.12.2022 | MC | 07.12.2022 | NL | 07.12.2022 | PL | 07.12.2022 | RO | 07.12.2022 | RS | 07.12.2022 | SE | 07.12.2022 | SI | 07.12.2022 | SK | 07.12.2022 | SM | 07.12.2022 | NO | 07.03.2023 | GR | 08.03.2023 | IE | 22.03.2023 | LU | 22.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | IS | 07.04.2023 | PT | 10.04.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 07.12.2022 | |
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 07.12.2022 | |
NO | 07.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006028439 (APERIO TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]WO2009093050 (RENISHAW PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, line 29 - page 8, line 17; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2012257037 (RAICU VALERICA [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0052] , [0056] - [0062]; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US2014313314 (CRANDALL GREG J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] , [0174]; figure 22 * | International search | [A]JP2012189891 (NANO PHOTON KK) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0051] to [0056] & US 2014/0002819 A1 paragraphs [0068] to [0073] & WO 2012/124303 A1 & EP 2685303 A1 *; | [A]JP2014048088 (TORAY ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0049] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014507662 (Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.) [A] 1-6* , paragraphs [0034], [0035] & US 2013/0050782 A1 paragraphs [0050], [0051] & WO 2012/115979 A1 & EP 2678660 A & CA 2827726 A * | Examination | US2014313313 |