EP3275647 - TRANSFER FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/05] | TRANSFER FOIL | ||
[2019/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAKURA Yoshihiro c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
HATTORI Ryoji c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 16768821.7 | 23.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016JP59185 | Priority number, date | JP20150059745 | 23.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015059745 | JP20160057423 | 22.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016057423 | [2018/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016152918 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3275647 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3275647 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/23, B42D25/36, B42D25/328, B42D25/45, B42D25/47, B32B7/06, B32B25/08, B32B27/30, B44C1/17 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
B44C1/1712 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (US);
B32B25/14 (US);
B32B27/30 (EP,US);
B32B37/025 (US);
B32B7/06 (EP,US);
B42D25/23 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/45 (EP,US);
B42D25/47 (EP,US);
C08J7/042 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
B05D1/30 (US);
B05D3/067 (US);
B32B2425/00 (US);
C08J2367/02 (US);
C08J2479/04 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | B32B7/06, B32B25/08, B32B27/30, B42D25/23, B42D25/45, B42D25/328, B42D25/47, B42D25/24, B44C1/17 | ||
Former IPC [2018/05] | B32B25/08, B32B7/06, B32B27/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSFERFILM | [2019/26] | English: | TRANSFER FILM | [2019/26] | French: | FILM DE TRANSFERT | [2019/26] |
Former [2018/05] | TRANSFERFOLIE | ||
Former [2018/05] | TRANSFER FOIL | ||
Former [2018/05] | FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | Translation filed | 14.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 30.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2016 | AL | 26.06.2019 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 23.03.2020 | LU | 23.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.03.2016 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 23.03.2016 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10129134 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP3140820B (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2010028586 (ENLOW HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2172347 (LEONHARD KURZ STIFTUNG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-2; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP2270277 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0196]; figures 3,4,6,8-11,13,14; claims 1-15 * | International search | [A]JPS60108483 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0345391 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text & US 5427997 A & WO 1991/001223 A1 & EP 487727 A1 *; | [Y]JPH05155199 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0016], [0017] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH10129134 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 2-7 * , paragraphs [0032] to [0034], [0036] (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10315639 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text & US 6001771 A *; | [Y]JP2006001211 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0007], [0009], [0014], [0015] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007118466 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0014], [0016], [0032], [0037], [0039] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009137239 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 3-5 * , paragraph [0052] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013256105 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0044] (Family: none) *; | [EA]JP2016097668 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [EA] 1-11* , entire text (Family: none) * |