EP3352674 - DEVICE FOR FIXATING A MEDICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medacc Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 1E 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TCHANG, Benjamin Ching Yi Valkenlaar 61 4854 GR Bavel / NL | 02 /
DONKER, Victor Barend Hendrik Aalsterweg 169 5644 RA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VERBEEK, Jori Marcellinus Nicole Hastelweg 49 5616 HJ Eindhoven / NL | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16771010.2 | 07.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016NL50622 | Priority number, date | NL20151041488 | 24.09.2015 Original published format: NL 1041488 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017052363 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352674 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, G10K11/00, A61B90/50 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
A61B8/4227 (EP,US);
A61B8/4209 (EP,US);
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61B8/4411 (EP,US);
A61B8/4461 (EP,US);
A61B8/4477 (US);
A61B90/50 (EP,US);
G10K11/004 (EP,US);
G10K11/352 (EP,US);
G10K11/355 (EP,US);
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3407 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FIXIERUNG EINES MEDIZINISCHEN INSTRUMENTS | [2018/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXATING A MEDICAL INSTRUMENT | [2018/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN INSTRUMENT MÉDICAL | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 21.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO8703190 (KOIVUKANGAS JOHN PERTTI, et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,20,21 * abstract * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 22 * [A] 22; | [X]DE9210071U (KEMPF FRIEDEMANN [DE]) [X] 1-9,11-13,15-17,19-22 * page 3, paragraph 7 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP0607490 (ALOKA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-9,12-20 * abstract * * column 7, line 41 - column 9, line 4 * * column 12, line 5 - column 15, line 17 * * figures 3-4, 7-10 *; | [A]WO9712552 (HON EDWARD H [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004064642 (USCOM LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 25 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2013110973 (CARDIAC IMPULSE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0331348 | US6301989 | US2011022034 | EP2666414 |